ME LD1968 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Appropriate Placement of Defendants with Mental Illness and Intellectual Disabilities
Title
An Act To Ensure Appropriate Placement of Defendants with Mental Illness and Intellectual Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #786 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - Adopt Hah-1030 To Cah-947 RC #583 (Y: 78 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - Adopt Hah-1030 To Cah-947 RC #583 (Y: 78 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-947) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-638) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-947) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-638) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-947) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-638) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-638) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-947) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby House Amendment "A" (H-1030) was ADOPTED AND to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the same |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-947) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-947) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-947) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-1030) thereto in concurrence |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-947) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-1030) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-19 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-1030) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-947) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-947) READ |
2022-04-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 786 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-04-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-947) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-1030) thereto. |
2022-04-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-947) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-1030) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2022-04-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 583 (Yeas 78 - Nays 56 - Absent 13 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-04-19 | House | On motion of Representative TALBOT ROSS of Portland, House Amendment "A" (H-1030) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-947) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-947) was READ. |
2022-04-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-19 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-19 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2022-04-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2022-04-07 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-06 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-03-04 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2022-02-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |