ME LD1948 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-23 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-23 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enhance Access to, Education Regarding and Patient and Community Safety in Maine's Marijuana Programs
Title
An Act To Enhance Access to, Education Regarding and Patient and Community Safety in Maine's Marijuana Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Ned Claxton [D] | Rep. Kathleen Dillingham [R] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] | Rep. Laura Supica [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] | Rep. Lynne Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-02-17 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1948&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0685&item=1&snum=130 |