ME LD1946 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Access to Mental and Behavioral Health Care by Providing Care in Clinical Reproductive and Sexual Health Care Settings
Title
An Act To Improve Access to Mental and Behavioral Health Care by Providing Care in Clinical Reproductive and Sexual Health Care Settings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2020-01-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-14 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2020-01-14 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2020-01-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-08 | House | Later today assigned. |
2020-01-08 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2020-01-08 | House | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1946&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1390&item=1&snum=129 |