ME LD193 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize InterCoast Career Institute To Grant the Degree of Associate Degree in Applied Science
Title
An Act To Authorize InterCoast Career Institute To Grant the Degree of Associate Degree in Applied Science
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Chase [R] | Sen. Ronald Collins [R] | Rep. Aaron Libby [R] | Rep. Mary Nelson [D] |
Rep. Wayne Parry [R] | Rep. Heather Sirocki [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-05-31 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-05-31 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-02-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence. |
2013-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-02-05 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |