ME LD1920 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enact the Interstate Counseling Compact To Address Inequities in Access to Clinical Counseling Services and Increase Maine's Provider Workforce
Title
An Act To Enact the Interstate Counseling Compact To Address Inequities in Access to Clinical Counseling Services and Increase Maine's Provider Workforce
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Rep. Heidi Brooks [D] | Rep. Edward Crockett [D] | Sen. Heather Sanborn [D] |
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Rep. Denise Tepler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-779), in concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-779) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-779). |
2022-03-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-03-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-02-24 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-02-01 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-02-01 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2022-01-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2022. |