ME LD1917 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Implement Ranked-choice Voting for Governor, State Senator and State Representative
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Implement Ranked-choice Voting for Governor, State Senator and State Representative
Sponsors
Sen. Cameron Reny [D] | Rep. Lydia Crafts [D] | Sen. Nicole Grohoski [D] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] |
Rep. Morgan Rielly [D] | Rep. Charles Skold [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #267 (Y: 79 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-25 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-07-25 | Senate | FAILED FINAL PASSED - Emergency 2/3 of the membership of the Senate present was necessary in concurrence |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - 2/3 Present Required, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2023-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-21 | House | FAILED FINAL PASSAGE. |
2023-06-21 | House | This being a Constitutional Amendment, in accordance with the provisions of Section 4 of Article X of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of the membership of the House present was necessary. |
2023-06-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-20 | House | The RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-367). |
2023-06-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-20 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-20 | House | The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 267 (Yeas 79 - Nays 65 - Absent 6 - Excused 1) |
2023-06-20 | House | On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-20 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-20 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-09 | House | The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |