ME LD1913 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Support Emerging Adults Involved in the Criminal Justice System
Title
An Act to Support Emerging Adults Involved in the Criminal Justice System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Reported Out: LTW |
2023-05-12 | Joint | LTW Approved by Chairs |
2023-05-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1913&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0773&item=1&snum=131 |