ME LD1913 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create the Electric Ratepayer Advisory Council
Title
An Act To Create the Electric Ratepayer Advisory Council
Sponsors
Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Sen. Stacy Brenner [D] | Sen. Glenn Curry [D] |
Rep. Jessica Fay [D] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Teresa Pierce [D] |
Sen. Joseph Rafferty [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #741 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-12 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-04-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-529). |
2022-04-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-529) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-12 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-529) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-529) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 741 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2022-04-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 10, 2022 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |