ME LD1911 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Improve Access to Services for Adults with Serious and Persistent Mental Illness

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Improve Access to Services for Adults with Serious and Persistent Mental Illness

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - Table Until Later RC #615 (Y: 75 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13HouseThe Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2018-07-09HouseUnfinished Business
2018-06-26HouseUnfinished Business
2018-06-25HouseUnfinished Business
2018-06-21HouseUnfinished Business
2018-05-02HouseCarried over to any special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2018-04-19HouseUnfinished Business
2018-04-18HouseLater today assigned.
2018-04-18HouseROLL CALL NO. 615 (Yeas 75 - Nays 71 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
2018-04-18HouseOn motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending REFERENCE.
2018-04-18HouseCommittee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback