ME LD191 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Permit Municipalities To Provide Assistance to Veterans in Paying Property Taxes
Title
An Act To Permit Municipalities To Provide Assistance to Veterans in Paying Property Taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Sen. Glenn Curry [D] | Rep. Lori Gramlich [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] | Sen. Joseph Rafferty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-47). |
2021-04-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-04-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-47). |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-47) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-25 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-03-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 25, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |