ME LD1909 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend Syringe Service Programs
Title
An Act To Amend Syringe Service Programs
Sponsors
Rep. Genevieve McDonald [D] | Rep. Michele Meyer [D] | Sen. Marianne Moore [R] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] |
Rep. Holly Stover [D] | Rep. William Tuell [R] | Rep. Samuel Zager [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #461 (Y: 77 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-784) in concurrence |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-784) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-784). |
2022-03-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-784) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 461 (Yeas 77 - Nays 54 - Absent 17 - Excused 0 - Vacant 3) |
2022-03-09 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-02-24 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-02-08 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2022-01-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2022-01-05 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |