ME LD1894 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Incentivize the Purchase of Electric Public School Buses
Title
An Act To Incentivize the Purchase of Electric Public School Buses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #423 (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Later today assigned. |
2020-03-17 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2020-03-17 | House | Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor moved to ACCEPT REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2020-03-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-421) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-421) READ and ADOPTED |
2020-03-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 423 Yeas 19 - Nays 10 - Excused 6 - Absent 0 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland Report A Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-12-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 20, 2019 and REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |