ME LD1894 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Restore Departmental Management over Costs of State-paid Child Care
Title
An Act To Restore Departmental Management over Costs of State-paid Child Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-10 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 311 (Yeas 75 - Nays 68 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-04-10 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-515). | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-515) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 305 (Yeas 76 - Nays 66 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-04-09 | (H) On motion of Representative PRESCOTT of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Subsequently, the reports were READ. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2012-04-06 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-515). | |
2012-04-05 | (S) PREVAILED | |
2012-04-05 | (S) (19 -Yeas, 16 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Roll Call Number 448 | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-515) ADOPTED. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-515). (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-515) READ. (Remarks Made) | |
2012-04-05 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-03 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-03 | (S) On further motion by same Senator, TABLED Until Later in Today's Session pending READING of Committee Amendment "A" (S-515). | |
2012-04-03 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-515) READ. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) On motion by Senator RECTOR of Knox, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED . | |
2012-04-03 | (S) Reports READ. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT | |
2012-03-20 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |