ME LD1889 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect the Products of Maine Farmers
Title
An Act To Protect the Products of Maine Farmers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-726), in concurrence. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-726) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-726). |
2020-03-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-03-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-12-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2019-12-24 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 20, 2019. |