ME LD1883 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Recommendations of the Federal Traumatic Brain Injury State Partnership Program Concerning the Membership of the Acquired Brain Injury Advisory Council
Title
An Act Regarding the Recommendations of the Federal Traumatic Brain Injury State Partnership Program Concerning the Membership of the Acquired Brain Injury Advisory Council
Sponsors
Rep. Allison Hepler [D] | Sen. Pinny Beebe-Center [D] | Sen. Henry Ingwersen [D] | Rep. Michele Meyer [D] |
Sen. Marianne Moore [R] | Rep. Holly Stover [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-02-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2020-02-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2020-02-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2020-02-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-02-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-12-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2019-12-24 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 20, 2019. |