ME LD1882 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - (S) FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - (S) FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs To Develop Legislation Establishing a Presidential Primary
Title
Resolve, Directing the Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs To Develop Legislation Establishing a Presidential Primary
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Beaulieu [R] | Sen. Emily Cain [D] | Rep. Michael Carey [D] | Sen. Jonathan Courtney [R] |
Rep. Philip Curtis [R] | Rep. Robert Nutting [R] | Sen. Kevin Raye [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | (S) FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) TAKEN from the Special Study Table by the President. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) On motion by Senator PLOWMAN of Penobscot, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE, pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Subsequently, FINALLY PASSED. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE. | |
2012-04-06 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-06 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-517). | |
2012-04-06 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2012-04-06 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-517) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-04-06 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-06 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 301 (Yeas 85 - Nays 57 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-04-06 | (H) On motion of Representative BEAULIEU of Auburn, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2012-04-06 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-517). | |
2012-04-05 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-517) READ and ADOPTED . | |
2012-04-04 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) PREVAILED | |
2012-04-04 | (S) (31 -Yeas, 4 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Roll Call Number 444 | |
2012-04-04 | (S) On motion by Senator FARNHAM of Penobscot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED . (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Reports READ. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) On motion by Senator Farnham of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS | |
2012-03-15 | (S) Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |