ME LD1873 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Direct the Commissioner of Education To Adopt a Model Policy Regarding Management of Head Injuries in School Activities and Athletics
Title
An Act To Direct the Commissioner of Education To Adopt a Model Policy Regarding Management of Head Injuries in School Activities and Athletics
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. | |
2012-05-17 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-05-17 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-05-16 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-05-16 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-606). | |
2012-05-16 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-606) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On further motion by same Senator, Senate Amendment "A" (S-606) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator ROSEN of Hancock. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) Reported by Senator LANGLEY for the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs pursuant to Joint Order 2011, S.P. 644. |