ME LD1870 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Create the Task Force To Study and Plan for the Implementation of Maine's Early Childhood Special Education Services
Title
Resolve, To Create the Task Force To Study and Plan for the Implementation of Maine's Early Childhood Special Education Services
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-04-18 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-04-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-457) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-479) thereto. |
2018-04-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-457) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-479) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2018-04-18 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-479) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-457) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-457) was READ. |
2018-04-18 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-04-18 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-18 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-457) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-479) thereto |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-457) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-479) thereto ADOPTED |
2018-04-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-479) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-457) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-457) READ |
2018-04-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-13 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senator MAKER of Washington moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Reports READ |
2018-03-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |