ME LD1870 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - (S) PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - (S) PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Supplemental Appropriations and Allocations for the Expenditures of State Government and To Change Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government To Address Revenue Shortfalls Projected for the Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2012
Title
An Act To Make Supplemental Appropriations and Allocations for the Expenditures of State Government and To Change Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government To Address Revenue Shortfalls Projected for the Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2012
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | (S) PREVAILED | |
2012-03-21 | (S) (29 -Yeas, 5 -Nays, 1 -Excused, 0 -Absent) | |
2012-03-21 | (S) Roll Call Number 385 | |
2012-03-21 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-778), in concurrence. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) House Amendment "A" (H-778) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) Subsequently, Report ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) FAILED | |
2012-03-15 | (S) (14 -Yeas, 20 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 1 -Absent) | |
2012-03-15 | (S) Roll Call Number 376 | |
2012-03-15 | (S) Motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland to Table Until Later in Today's Session FAILED. (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-03-15 | (S) Report READ. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-778). | |
2012-03-14 | (H) On motion of Representative FLOOD of Winthrop, House Amendment "A" (H-778) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Reported by Representative FLOOD for the Joint Standing Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs pursuant to Joint Order 2011, H.P. 1367. |