ME LD1865 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enhance Career and Technical Education
Title
An Act To Enhance Career and Technical Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. | |
2012-05-17 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-05-17 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-05-16 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-05-16 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-896) and Senate Amendment "B" (S-605) thereto and Senate Amendment "A" (S-530). | |
2012-05-16 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-896) AND Senate Amendment "B" (S-605) thereto AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-530), in NON-CONCURRENCE. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-605) thereto ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On further motion by same Senator, Senate Amendment "B" (S-605) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) READ and ADOPTED. (Remarks Made) | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On further motion by same Senator, under further suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-488), in concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendm ent "A" (S-518) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-896) thereto AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-530), in concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator ROSEN of Hancock. | |
2012-04-11 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-10 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock, The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-896) thereto AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-530). | |
2012-04-09 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-896) thereto and Senate Amendment "A" (S-530). | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Senate Amendment "A" (S-530) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-896) thereto was ADOPTED. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) On motion of Representative EDGECOMB of Caribou, House Amendment "A" (H-896) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) was READ. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) On motion of Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-530). | |
2012-04-09 | (S) On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock, Senate Amendment "A" (S-530) READ and ADOPTED. (Remarks Made) | |
2012-04-09 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) Report ACCEPTED . | |
2012-04-09 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-04 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-04 | (S) On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) Report. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Senator LANGLEY of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (S-518) Report. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Reports READ. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. | |
2012-03-12 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-12 | (S) On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS | |
2012-03-12 | (S) Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |