ME LD1861 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Implement Certain Recommendations of the Computer Science Education Task Force and To Update and Implement the Department of Education's Statewide Strategic Plan for Science, Technology, Engineering and Mathematics
Title
Resolve, To Implement Certain Recommendations of the Computer Science Education Task Force and To Update and Implement the Department of Education's Statewide Strategic Plan for Science, Technology, Engineering and Mathematics
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-04-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-757) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-475) thereto. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-757) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-475) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-757) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-475) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Senate Amendment "A" (S-475) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-757) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-757) READ |
2018-04-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-13 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senator MAKER of Washington moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Reports READ |
2018-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-12 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-757). |
2018-04-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-757) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-04-12 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2018-04-12 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Bill and accompanying papers REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-15 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
2018-03-15 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-15 | House | Representative KORNFIELD for the Joint Standing Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs pursuant to Resolve 2017, chapter 21, section 4 reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |