ME LD186 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Signs in a Public Right-of-way To Be Removed by the Landowner
Title
An Act To Allow Signs in a Public Right-of-way To Be Removed by the Landowner
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-03-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-17 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP |
2021-03-04 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-03-04 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-21 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 21, 2021. |