ME LD186 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reverse Jail Consolidation
Title
An Act To Reverse Jail Consolidation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Indef Pp Hah-496 To Cas-304 RC #376 (Y: 86 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #375 (Y: 131 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - Table Until Later RC #374 (Y: 46 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-06-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #375 (Y: 131 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - Table Until Later RC #374 (Y: 46 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-30 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-304) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-341) thereto. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-304) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-341) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-304) As Amended By Senate Amendment "B" (S-341) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-341) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-304) READ and ADOPTED |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-304) was ADOPTED |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-304) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending Enactment Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2015-06-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-304). |
2015-06-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-06-23 | House | Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (S-304) was ADOPTED. |
2015-06-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 376 (Yeas 86 - Nays 60 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-23 | House | On motion of Representative CAMPBELL of Newfield, House Amendment "A" (H-496) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-304) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2015-06-23 | House | On motion of Representative DEVIN of Newcastle, House Amendment "A" (H-496) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-304) was READ. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-304) was READ. |
2015-06-23 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-06-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 375 (Yeas 131 - Nays 14 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-23 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 374 (Yeas 46 - Nays 98 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-23 | House | Motion of Representative DEVIN of Newcastle to TABLE until later in today's session FAILED. |
2015-06-23 | House | Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2015-06-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-304) |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-304) READ and ADOPTED |
2015-06-22 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-06-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-01-29 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
2015-01-29 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |