ME LD186 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Summary
An Act Pertaining to the Possession of Animal Fighting Paraphernalia
Title
An Act Pertaining to the Possession of Animal Fighting Paraphernalia
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | |
2009-05-26 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) On motion of Representative HASKELL of Portland, The House ADHERED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 111 (Yeas 49 - Nays 97 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) | |
2009-05-26 | (H) Subsequently, the motion to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-05-21 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-20 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-20 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-05-20 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to RECEDE and CONCUR. | |
2009-05-20 | (H) Representative PIEH of Bremen MOVED to RECEDE and CONCUR. | |
2009-05-19 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-05-19 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-137) In NON-CONCURRENCE (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 81 28 Yeas - 6 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2009-05-19 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-44) On further motion by Same Senator Committee Amendment "A" (H-44) INDEFINITELY POSTPONED | |
2009-05-19 | (S) On motion by Senator SIMPSON of Androscoggin Senate Amendment "B" (S-137) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-05-19 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME | |
2009-05-19 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-44) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-05-19 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-19 | (S) On motion by Senator NUTTING of Androscoggin Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-44) Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2009-05-19 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President Senator WESTON of Waldo asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw her request for a roll call. | |
2009-05-19 | (S) On motion by Senator RAYE of Washington Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator NUTTING of Androscoggin to ACCEPT Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-44) Report In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2009-05-19 | (S) Senator NUTTING of Androscoggin moved to Accept Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-44) Report In NON-CONCURRENCE (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered | |
2009-05-19 | (S) Taken from the table by the President Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion to ACCEPT Majority Ought Not To Pass Report in concurrence | |
2009-05-18 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-14 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-13 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-12 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-07 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-06 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-15 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-15 | (S) (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland to ACCEPT Majority Ought Not To Pass Report in concurrence | |
2009-04-15 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-09 | (S) On motion by Senator NUTTING of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland to ACCEPT Majority Ought Not To Pass Report in concurrence | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland moved to Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report in concurrence Roll Call Ordered | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 13 (Yeas 122 - Nays 20 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) | |
2009-04-08 | (H) On motion of Representative HASKELL of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-01-21 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Gerzofsky of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-01-21 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |