ME LD1859 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish the Maine Emergency Medical Services Community Grant Program
Title
An Act To Establish the Maine Emergency Medical Services Community Grant Program
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Curry [D] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Louis Luchini [D] |
Rep. John Martin [D] | Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] | Rep. Michele Meyer [D] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] |
Sen. Joseph Rafferty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-446). |
2022-03-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-03-22 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-446). |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-446) READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-17 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |