ME LD1858 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Ensure Access to Newly Born Male Infant Circumcision by Requiring MaineCare Coverage
Title
An Act to Ensure Access to Newly Born Male Infant Circumcision by Requiring MaineCare Coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482. |
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-405), in concurrence. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-405) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-405). |
2023-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-03 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2023-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |