ME LD1853 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - (S) PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - (S) PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Environmental Oversight and Streamline Permitting for Metallic Mineral Mining in Maine
Title
An Act To Improve Environmental Oversight and Streamline Permitting for Metallic Mineral Mining in Maine
Sponsors
Rep. Bernard Ayotte [R] | Rep. Robert Duchesne [D] | Sen. Seth Goodall [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Rep. Ricky Long [R] | Rep. John Martin [D] | Rep. Roger Sherman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (S) PREVAILED | |
2012-04-13 | (S) (22 -Yeas, 13 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Roll Call Number 488 | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 334 (Yeas 78 - Nays 65 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) On motion of Representative HARLOW of Portland, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-940), in concurrence. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-940) ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) PREVAILED | |
2012-04-13 | (S) (23 -Yeas, 12 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Roll Call Number 479 | |
2012-04-13 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York, Senate Amendment "A" (S-558) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-940) INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-04-13 | (S) On motion by Senator DILL of Cumberland, Senate Amendment "A" (S-558) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-940) READ. (Remarks Made) | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-940) READ. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) PREVAILED | |
2012-04-13 | (S) (21 -Yeas, 14 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Roll Call Number 478 | |
2012-04-13 | (S) On motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Reports READ. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-940). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-940) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 327 (Yeas 80 - Nays 65 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-04-12 | (H) On motion of Representative HAMPER of Oxford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2012-03-12 | (S) On motion by Senator Saviello of Franklin, REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |