ME LD1848 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Extend Arrearage Management Programs
Title
An Act To Extend Arrearage Management Programs
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #665 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #645 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #645 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | in concurrence |
2018-05-02 | Senate | LD 1848 In Senate, May 2, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-05-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 645V 147 having voted in the affirmative and 0 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2018-05-02 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-04-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-708), in concurrence. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-708) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-708). |
2018-04-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-04-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator Woodsome of York REFERRED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-02-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-27 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY |
2018-02-27 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-27 | House | Representative BERRY for the Joint Standing Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 35-A, section 3214, subsection 2-A reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |