ME LD1846 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Amend a Circulator's Oath for Petitions and Nomination Papers by Including the Number of Signatures Collected
Title
An Act to Amend a Circulator's Oath for Petitions and Nomination Papers by Including the Number of Signatures Collected
Sponsors
Rep. David Boyer [R] | Sen. Eric Brakey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senator STEWART of Aroostook asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw their motion for a Roll Call. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered |
2023-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-08 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative RIELLY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-08 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2023-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-23 | House | Later today assigned. |
2023-05-23 | House | On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2023-05-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-05-19 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP |
2023-05-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-27 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-04-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-27 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |