ME LD1835 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - (S) PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - (S) PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Restore Equity in Revenue Sharing
Title
An Act To Restore Equity in Revenue Sharing
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Alfond [D] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Sen. Jonathan Courtney [R] | Rep. Barry Hobbins [D] |
Rep. Gary Knight [R] | Rep. Stephen Lovejoy [D] | Rep. Donald Pilon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | (S) PREVAILED | |
2012-04-12 | (S) (21 -Yeas, 14 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Roll Call Number 467 | |
2012-04-12 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-04-12 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President. | |
2012-04-11 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-11 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules on motion by Senator PLOWMAN of Penobscot TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-501). | |
2012-04-11 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 317 (Yeas 82 - Nays 63 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-04-11 | (H) On motion of Representative KNIGHT of Livermore Falls, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-501).. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) READ and ADOPTED . | |
2012-04-10 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) PREVAILED | |
2012-04-10 | (S) (19 -Yeas, 15 -Nays, 1 -Excused, 0 -Absent) | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Roll Call Number 460 | |
2012-04-10 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED . (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-04-10 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-05 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-04 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-03 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-02 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-03-30 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reports READ. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. | |
2012-02-29 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-02-29 | (S) On motion by Senator Courtney of York REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION . | |
2012-02-29 | (S) Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed |