ME LD1834 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - The Bill was in the possession of the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - The Bill was in the possession of the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue To Provide for Student Loan Debt Relief
Title
An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue To Provide for Student Loan Debt Relief
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | House | The Bill was in the possession of the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-05-02 | House | Carried over to the next special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2018-02-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1834&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1276&item=1&snum=128 |