ME LD1829 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Direct the Maine Prescription Drug Affordability Board to Assess Strategies to Reduce Prescription Drug Costs and to Take Steps to Implement Reference-based Pricing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Direct the Maine Prescription Drug Affordability Board to Assess Strategies to Reduce Prescription Drug Costs and to Take Steps to Implement Reference-based Pricing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #435 (Y: 78 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #625 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-10SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
2024-04-02SenateOn motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2024-04-01HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-04-01HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2024-03-28HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-03-28HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-613).
2024-03-28HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2024-03-28HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-613) was READ and ADOPTED.
2024-03-28HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2024-03-28HouseROLL CALL NO. 435 (Yeas 78 - Nays 66 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
2024-03-28HouseOn motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2024-03-28HouseReports READ.
2024-03-27SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2024-03-27SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-613)
2024-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-613) READ and ADOPTED
2024-03-27SenateREAD ONCE
2024-03-27SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 625 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
2024-03-27SenateOn motion by Senator BAILEY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2024-03-27SenateReports READ
2024-03-26JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2024-02-01JointVoted: Divided Report
2024-02-01JointWork Session Held
2024-01-30JointWork Session Held
2024-01-25JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2023-07-26SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
2023-07-25JointCarry Over Approved
2023-06-01JointCarry Over Requested
2023-05-24JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2023-04-27HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-04-27HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
2023-04-27SenateCommittee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback