ME LD1829 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Education
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-02 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-694) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-427). |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-03-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-694) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-427) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Senate Amendment "A" (S-427) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-694) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-03-29 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Subsequently Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Report READ |
2018-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-694). |
2018-03-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2018-02-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |