ME LD1828 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Validate Certain Proceedings Authorizing the Issuance of Bonds and Notes by the City of Bath
Title
An Act To Validate Certain Proceedings Authorizing the Issuance of Bonds and Notes by the City of Bath
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #558 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-02 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 558 Yeas 29 - Nays 5 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Subsequently Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED Roll Call Ordered |
2018-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-03-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-03-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2018-02-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |