ME LD1828 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - (S) In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - (S) In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Public Safety in the Operation of Casinos
Title
An Act To Protect Public Safety in the Operation of Casinos
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | (S) In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). | |
2012-03-19 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-431) | |
2012-03-14 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-03-14 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-431). | |
2012-03-14 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-431) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-02-23 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-02-23 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |