ME LD1823 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Repeal of a Provision of Law Allowing Certain Nonresidents To Hunt Deer before the Open Season on Deer
Title
An Act Regarding the Repeal of a Provision of Law Allowing Certain Nonresidents To Hunt Deer before the Open Season on Deer
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #579 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #548 (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #548 (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | in concurrence |
2018-04-03 | Senate | LD 1823 In Senate, April 3, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 548V 136 having voted in the affirmative and 6 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and 0 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2018-04-02 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-03-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-01 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-03-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-01 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Bill and accompanying papers REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE, in concurrence. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-02-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-06 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE |
2018-02-06 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-06 | House | Representative DUCHESNE for the Joint Standing Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife pursuant to Joint Order 2017, H.P. 1249 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |