ME LD1823 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, To Review and Update the Telecommunications Taxation Laws
Title
Resolve, To Review and Update the Telecommunications Taxation Laws
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-484). | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-03-26 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-484) In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-03-26 | (S) On motion by Senator PERRY of Penobscot Senate Amendment "A" (S-484) READ and ADOPTED (Remarks Made) | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-03-26 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence | |
2010-03-26 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-26 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-25 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-25 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2010-03-24 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) The Resolve was READ ONCE. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Reported by Representative WATSON for the Joint Standing Committee on Taxation pursuant to Public Law 2009, chapter 213, Part P, section 2. |