ME LD182 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Protect Firefighters by Establishing a Prohibition on the Sale and Distribution of New Upholstered Furniture Containing Certain Flame-retardant Chemicals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Protect Firefighters by Establishing a Prohibition on the Sale and Distribution of New Upholstered Furniture Containing Certain Flame-retardant Chemicals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #430 (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #443 (Y: 123 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Enactment RC #412 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - House - Enactment RC #433 (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #247 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #152 (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02Senatein concurrence
2017-08-02SenateLD 182 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 31 IN FAVOR and 1 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2017-08-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-08-02HouseROLL CALL NO. 443V 123 having voted in the affirmative and 14 in the negative, with 13 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
2017-08-02HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2017-07-20SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 412 Yeas 26 - Nays 0 - Excused 9 - Absent 0
2017-07-20SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2017-07-20SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-07-20SenateOn motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-07-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-20HouseROLL CALL NO. 433 (Yeas 127 - Nays 5 - Absent 18 - Excused 1)
2017-07-20HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-07-20HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-20HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-215) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-338) thereto.
2017-07-20SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-07-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-215) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-338) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-07-20SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-215) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-338) thereto ADOPTED
2017-07-20SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-338) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-215) READ and ADOPTED
2017-07-20SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator RECONSIDERED whereby The Senate ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (H-215)
2017-07-20SenateOn motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
2017-07-20SenateOn Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2017-06-09SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT
2017-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-08HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-215) in concurrence
2017-06-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-215) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-07SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-07SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 247 Yeas 34 - Nays 1 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2017-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
2017-06-07SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-06-06SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-05SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-01SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-31SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-30SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-25SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-25SenateOn motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
2017-05-25SenateReports READ
2017-05-24HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-24HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-215).
2017-05-24HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-05-24HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-215) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-05-24HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-05-24HouseROLL CALL NO. 152 (Yeas 139 - Nays 5 - Absent 5 - Excused 2)
2017-05-24HouseOn motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-05-24HouseReports READ.
2017-01-26SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence
2017-01-26HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-26HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
2017-01-26HouseCommittee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=182&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0138&item=1&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0138&item=2&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0138&item=7&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0138&item=9&snum=128
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280062738&chamber=House&serialnumber=152
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280062738&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=247
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280062738&chamber=House&serialnumber=433
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280062738&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=412
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280062738&chamber=House&serialnumber=443
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280062738&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=430

Bill Comments

feedback