ME LD1817 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 13 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-10 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 13 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-10 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Support Outdoor Education by Establishing the Outdoor School for All Maine Students Program
Title
An Act to Support Outdoor Education by Establishing the Outdoor School for All Maine Students Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482. |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2024-05-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-192) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-261) AND Senate Amendment "B" (S-760) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-192) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-261) AND Senate Amendment "B" (S-760) thereto ADOPTED |
2024-05-10 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-760) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-192) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-192) was ADOPTED |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-192) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-261) thereto |
2024-05-10 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2023-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-14 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2023-06-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-192) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-261) thereto. |
2023-06-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-192) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-261) thereto ADOPTED. |
2023-06-13 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-261) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-192) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-192) was READ. |
2023-06-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-13 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-192) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-261) thereto |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-192) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-261) thereto ADOPTED |
2023-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator INGWERSEN of York Senate Amendment "A" (S-261) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-192) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-192) READ |
2023-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Subsequently Report Accepted |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Report READ |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-27 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-27 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |