ME LD1816 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - .
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - .
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Penalties for Hunting Deer over Bait
Title
An Act Regarding the Penalties for Hunting Deer over Bait
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #562 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #569 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #569 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | . |
2018-04-03 | House | Sent to the Engrossing Department. |
2018-04-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 562V 142 having voted in the affirmative and 0 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2018-04-03 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2018-04-02 | Senate | LD 1816 In Senate, April 2, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-06 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-03-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2018-02-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-01 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |