ME LD1813 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 565 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 565 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Children under 14 Years of Age from Being Photographed by Certain Persons
Title
An Act To Protect Children under 14 Years of Age from Being Photographed by Certain Persons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Enactment RC #565 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 565 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-656) in concurrence |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-656) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-03-27 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-656). |
2018-03-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-22 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2018-02-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-01 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |