ME LD1812 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on March 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing an Independent, Nonpartisan, Objective Evaluation of the Provision of Indigent Legal Services
Title
Resolve, Directing an Independent, Nonpartisan, Objective Evaluation of the Provision of Indigent Legal Services
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required |
2018-04-09 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-28 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-03-28 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-657) in concurrence |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-657) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-03-27 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-22 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-657). |
2018-03-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-657) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-03-22 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2018-03-22 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-22 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Bill and accompanying papers REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY, in concurrence. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-01-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-30 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY |
2018-01-30 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-01-30 | House | Representative MOONEN for the Joint Standing Committee on Judiciary pursuant to Public Law 2017, chapter 284, Pt. UUUU, section 17 reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |