ME LD1809 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Sent to the Engrossing Department.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Sent to the Engrossing Department.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Issuance of Burn Permits
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Issuance of Burn Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #733 (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-07-09 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #715 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-07-09 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #715 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | House | Sent to the Engrossing Department. |
2018-07-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-07-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 733V 139 having voted in the affirmative and 5 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2018-07-09 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-07-09 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-07-09 | Senate | LD 1809 In Senate, July 9, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-06-21 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-417) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-517) thereto. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-417) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-517) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-417) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-517) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-517) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-417) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-417) was ADOPTED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-417) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-02 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-417). |
2018-03-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-417). |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-417) READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-01-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |