ME LD180 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Allow a Person to File a Paper Copy of a Timber Harvest Notification Form

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Allow a Person to File a Paper Copy of a Timber Harvest Notification Form

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23SenatePursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2023-03-17JointReported Out: ONTP
2023-03-13JointVoted: ONTP
2023-03-13JointWork Session Held
2023-03-01JointWork Session Reconsidered: TABLED
2023-02-15JointVoted: ONTP
2023-02-15JointWork Session Held
2023-01-17HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-01-17HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
2023-01-17SenateCommittee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback