ME LD180 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Allow Terminally Ill Patients To Choose To Use Experimental Treatments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Allow Terminally Ill Patients To Choose To Use Experimental Treatments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-23 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #539 (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #503 (Y: 114 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2016-03-24HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2016-03-24HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2016-03-23SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2016-03-23SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-577)
2016-03-23SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-577) READ and ADOPTED
2016-03-23SenateREAD ONCE
2016-03-23SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 539 Yeas 20 - Nays 11 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
2016-03-23SenateOn motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2016-03-23SenateReports READ
2016-03-22HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2016-03-22HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-577).
2016-03-22HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2016-03-22HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-577) was READ and ADOPTED.
2016-03-22HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2016-03-22HouseROLL CALL NO. 503 (Yeas 114 - Nays 28 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
2016-03-22HouseOn motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2016-03-22HouseReports READ.
2015-07-21SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
2015-06-30SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence.
2015-06-30HouseCarried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
2015-06-30SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence
2015-02-03SenateOn motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence.
2015-01-29HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-01-29HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2015-01-29HouseCommittee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback