ME LD1797 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in -concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in -concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 418: Maine Solid Waste Management Rules: Beneficial Use of Solid Wastes, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Environmental Protection
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 418: Maine Solid Waste Management Rules: Beneficial Use of Solid Wastes, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Environmental Protection
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in -concurrence. |
2018-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-02 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-04-02 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-670), in concurrence. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-670) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-27 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-670). |
2018-03-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-27 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator Saviello of Franklin REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-01-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-23 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2018-01-23 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative TUCKER for the Department of Environmental Protection pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |