ME LD1795 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Maine Criminal Code and Related Statutes as Recommended by the Criminal Law Advisory Commission
Title
An Act To Amend the Maine Criminal Code and Related Statutes as Recommended by the Criminal Law Advisory Commission
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #606 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #582 (Y: 107 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #582 (Y: 107 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | in concurrence |
2018-04-11 | Senate | LD 1795 In Senate, April 11, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 IN FAVOR and 1 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-04-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 582V 107 having voted in the affirmative and 40 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and 0 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2018-04-10 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-03-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-27 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-650) in concurrence |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-650) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-03-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-650). |
2018-03-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-03-20 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-650) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-03-20 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-03-20 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-20 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-01-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2018-01-23 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative WARREN for the Criminal Law Advisory Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 17-A, section 1354, subsection 2, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |