ME LD1794 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Cancel the No-bid Alexander Group Contract To Produce Savings in Fiscal Year 2013-14
Title
An Act To Cancel the No-bid Alexander Group Contract To Produce Savings in Fiscal Year 2013-14
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D] | Rep. Margaret Craven [D] | Sen. Colleen Lachowicz [D] | Rep. Andrew Gattine [D] |
Rep. Peter Stuckey [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #771 (Y: 83 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-03-31 - House - Adopt Hah-760 RC #605 (Y: 77 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #491 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #564 (Y: 80 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - Adopt Hah-760 RC #605 (Y: 77 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #491 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #564 (Y: 80 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | House | (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.) |
2014-05-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 771V 83 having voted in the affirmative and 63 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained. |
2014-05-01 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2014-04-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator Hill of York. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-04-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-760) thereto , in concurrence. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-684) |
2014-03-31 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-31 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2014-03-31 | House | Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-684) and House Amendment "A" (H-760). |
2014-03-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 605 (Yeas 77 - Nays 57 - Absent 17 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-31 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-760) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-31 | House | On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-684). |
2014-03-31 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-28 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-03-28 | House | On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-684) , in concurrence. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-684) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-03-26 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 491 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Reports READ |
2014-03-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-684). |
2014-03-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-25 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-684) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-25 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-25 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 564 (Yeas 80 - Nays 60 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-25 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-25 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-03-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-19 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-03-19 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2014-03-19 | House | Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2014-03-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2014-02-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-27 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2014-02-27 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |