ME LD1790 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding Youth Hunting Day for Hunting Bear and Carrying a Handgun during the Regular Archery-only Season on Deer

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding Youth Hunting Day for Hunting Bear and Carrying a Handgun during the Regular Archery-only Season on Deer

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-03-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-20HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-03-15HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-15HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-369).
2018-03-15HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2018-03-15HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2018-03-06SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2018-03-06SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-369)
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-369) READ and ADOPTED
2018-03-06SenateREAD ONCE
2018-03-06SenateSubsequently On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec The Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-369) Report ACCEPTED
2018-03-06SenateTaken from the table by the President
2018-03-01SenateUnfinished Business
2018-03-01SenateOn motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report
2018-03-01SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED
2018-01-16HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-01-16HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
2018-01-16SenateCommittee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback