ME LD179 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Creating a Police Standoff a Class E Crime
Title
An Act To Make Creating a Police Standoff a Class E Crime
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Longstaff [D] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Rep. Kathleen Dillingham [R] | Rep. Sheldon Hanington [R] |
Sen. Louis Luchini [D] | Rep. Catherine Nadeau [D] | Rep. Michael Perkins [R] | Rep. John Schneck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-163) in concurrence |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-163) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-163). |
2017-05-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-163) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-17 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2017-01-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |